Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/20/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/04/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/04/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/05/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/15/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/18/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/29/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/29/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/05/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/12/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/12/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/29/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/27/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/05/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 03/05/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/13/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/01/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/23/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/09/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/12/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/25/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/16/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/24/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/24/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/30/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/15/2008