Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/03/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/15/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/17/2008