Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/25/2008