Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/24/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/18/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/24/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/09/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/09/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/12/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/14/2008