Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/24/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 09/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/31/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/05/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/17/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2008