Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/22/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 01/22/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/22/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/22/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/22/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/22/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/22/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/24/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/24/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/29/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/29/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/31/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/05/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/05/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/05/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/05/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/05/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/05/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/05/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/05/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/05/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/05/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/05/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/07/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/07/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/07/2007