Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 09/25/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/09/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/16/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/16/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/12/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/12/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/19/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/19/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/19/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/21/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/03/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/08/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/23/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008