Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/06/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/16/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/13/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/13/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/01/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/09/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/30/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/06/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/26/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/09/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/24/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/26/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/26/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/03/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/03/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/03/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/03/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/19/2008