Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/27/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/27/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/04/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/09/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/18/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/23/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/25/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/13/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/11/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 12/11/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/16/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/14/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/04/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/04/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/04/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/21/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/11/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/18/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/30/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/30/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/30/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/30/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/30/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/29/2008