Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/01/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/10/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/10/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/10/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/01/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/09/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/09/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/09/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/09/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/14/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/04/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/04/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/05/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/11/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/18/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/16/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/16/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/16/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/16/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/16/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/16/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/16/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/22/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/22/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/14/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/14/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/27/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/04/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/17/2008