Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-108 (10/31/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on October 25, 2007. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Internet Tax Freedom Act Amendments Act of 2007 - Amends the Internet Tax Freedom Act to extend until November 1, 2014, the moratorium on state and local taxation of Internet access and electronic commerce (moratorium) and the exemption from such moratorium for states with previously enacted Internet tax laws (grandfathering provisions).

Redefines, effective November 1, 2003, "Internet access" to prevent certain states from claiming an expanded exemption under the Internet Tax Nondiscrimination Act from the moratorium. Delays the application of such redefinition until June 30, 2008, for a state or local tax on Internet access that is: (1) generally imposed and actually enforced on telecommunication services; or (2) the subject of litigation instituted in a state court prior to July 1, 2007.

Expands the term "Internet access" to include related communication services (e.g., emails and instant messaging). Redefines "telecommunications" to include unregulated non-utility telecommunications (e.g., cable services).

Provides for a specific exception to the moratorium for certain state business taxes enacted between June 20, 2005, and before November 1, 2007, that do not discriminate against providers of communication services, Internet access, or telecommunications.

Repeals the exception from the moratorium for taxing Voice over Internet Protocol (VoIP).

Renders inapplicable the grandfather provisions of the Internet Tax Freedom Act for states that repealed or nullified their tax laws on Internet access more than 24 months prior to the enactment of this Act.

Makes the amendments made by this Act effective November 1, 2007.