Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/15/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/16/2008