Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/05/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/05/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/05/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/05/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/26/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/27/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/12/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/12/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/12/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/23/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/23/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/23/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 08/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/03/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/06/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/12/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/15/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/15/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/13/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/08/2008