There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Benefits Awareness Act of 2008

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Benefits Awareness Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Benefits Awareness Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to advertise in the national media to promote awareness of benefits under laws administered by the Secretary.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/20/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4185)
05/15/2008Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 110-644.
09/27/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/21/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/20/2008-12:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/20/2008-12:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4185)
05/20/2008-12:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3681.
05/20/2008-12:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4185-4187)
05/20/2008-12:29pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/15/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405.
05/15/2008HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 110-644.
04/30/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/30/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/23/2008HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/23/2008HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/16/2008HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
10/01/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/27/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/27/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/27/2007 Referred to
04/30/2008 Markup by
05/15/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-644
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity10/01/2007 Referred to
04/16/2008 Hearings by
04/23/2008 Markup by
04/23/2008 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/21/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3681.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3681. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/20/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 15, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans Benefits Awareness Act of 2008 - Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to purchase advertising in national media outlets to promote awareness of veterans' benefits, including assistance for homeless veterans, the promotion of veteran-owned small businesses, opportunities for employment in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), and for education, training, compensation, pension, vocational rehabilitation, and health care benefits, as well as mental health care (including the prevention of suicide among veterans).