Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/10/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/11/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/11/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/16/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/23/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/02/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/26/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/25/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2008