There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

U.S. Capitol Police and Library of Congress Police Merger Implementation Act of 2007

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

U.S. Capitol Police and Library of Congress Police Merger Implementation Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to House

U.S. Capitol Police and Library of Congress Police Merger Implementation Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

U.S. Capitol Police and Library of Congress Police Merger Implementation Act of 2007

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

U.S. Capitol Police and Library of Congress Police Merger Implementation Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the transfer of the Library of Congress police to the United States Capitol Police, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
01/07/2008Became Public Law No: 110-178. (TXT | PDF)
01/07/2008Signed by President.
12/27/2007Presented to President.
12/18/2007Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 1182).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H16792-16794)
12/17/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/05/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H14207-14209)
12/04/2007Committee on Transportation discharged.
12/04/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 110-470, Part I.
09/27/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/07/2008Became Public Law No: 110-178. (TXT | PDF)
01/07/2008Signed by President.
12/27/2007HousePresented to President.
12/18/2007-5:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/18/2007-5:55pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 1182). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H16792-16794)
12/18/2007-5:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/18/2007-5:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 3690.
12/18/2007-5:20pmHouseMr. Brady (PA) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H16792-16794, H16795-16796)
12/17/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2007SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2007SenateS.Amdt.3869 Amendment SA 3869 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2007SenateS.Amdt.3869 Amendment SA 3869 proposed by Senator Dodd for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S15790) In the nature of a substitute.
12/17/2007SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S15790)
12/06/2007SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/05/2007-4:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2007-4:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H14207-14209)
12/05/2007-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3690.
12/05/2007-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H14207-14211)
12/05/2007-3:54pmHouseMr. Brady (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/04/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 293.
12/04/2007HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
12/04/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 110-470, Part I.
11/07/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
11/07/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
09/28/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/27/2007HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
09/27/2007HouseReferred to House Administration
09/27/2007HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/27/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/27/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Committee on House Administration09/27/2007 Referred to
11/07/2007 Markup by
12/04/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-470
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/27/2007 Referred to
12/04/2007 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management09/28/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3690. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-178 (01/07/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 17, 2007. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

U.S. Capitol Police and Library of Congress Police Merger Implementation Act of 2007 - (Sec. 2) Transfers each Library of Congress (LOC) police employee and each LOC civilian employee to the U.S. Capitol Police.

States that: (1) a LOC Police employee shall become a member of the Capitol Police on the employee's transfer date if the Chief of the Capitol Police determines and issues a written certification that the employee meets specified eligibility requirements; and (2) if the Chief determines that such requirements are not met, then such employee shall become a civilian employee of the Capitol Police.

Requires the determination to be made for all LOC Police employees before FY2010.

Exempts LOC Police employees who become members of the Capitol Police from federal mandatory separation law, subject to specified conditions.

Entitles any creditable service accrued by such LOC Police employees before becoming a Capitol Police to be included in calculating the employee's service as a member of the Capitol Police for purposes of the Federal Employees Retirement System (FERS) and the Civil Service Retirement System (CSRS).

Provides that: (1) the transfer of such personnel shall not cause any such employee to be separated or receive a reduction in pay; and (2) any credited annual, sick leave, other leave, or compensatory leave of the individual shall be transferred to the individual's credit as a member or employee of the Capitol Police.

Prohibits the Chief from imposing a probationary period with respect to any individual transferred under this Act.

Cancels a specified portion of the unobligated balance of the FEDLINK Revolving Fund for the Federal Library and Information Network (FEDLINK) program of the Library of Congress and its Federal Research program.

(Sec. 5) Requires the Librarian of Congress to establish standards and regulations for the physical security, control, and preservation of the Library of Congress collections and property, and or maintenance of suitable order and decorum within the Library.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Library of Congress Fiscal Operations Improvement Act of 2000 to provide for payment of Capitol Police services for Library of Congress special events.