Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/27/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/10/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/10/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/10/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/10/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/10/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/10/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/10/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/10/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/17/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/17/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/17/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/18/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/18/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/18/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/18/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/18/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/18/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/24/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 10/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/29/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/29/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/30/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/31/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/31/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/05/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/06/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/09/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/04/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/10/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/10/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/17/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/06/2008