Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/10/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/27/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/27/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/02/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/10/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/10/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/10/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/22/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/03/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/11/2008