Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 10/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/18/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/01/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/06/2008