Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/16/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/17/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/31/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/06/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/09/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/12/2008