Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/18/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/18/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/23/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/21/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/14/2007