Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/04/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/05/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/09/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/04/2008