Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/01/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/26/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/01/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/01/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/16/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/16/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/11/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2008