Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/05/2008