There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Senior Executive Service Diversity Assurance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Senior Executive Service Diversity Assurance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Senior Executive Service Diversity Assurance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for greater diversity within, and to improve policy direction and oversight of, the Senior Executive Service.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/03/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4846-4847)
05/22/2008Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 110-672.
10/09/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/19/2008SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
06/04/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/03/2008-3:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/03/2008-3:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4846-4847)
06/03/2008-3:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3774.
06/03/2008-3:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4846-4848)
06/03/2008-3:24pmHouseMr. Davis (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/22/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 423.
05/22/2008HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 110-672.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/01/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/01/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
04/15/2008HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia
04/03/2008SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia
10/11/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
10/09/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
10/09/2007HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2089-2090)
10/09/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform10/09/2007 Referred to
05/01/2008 Markup by
05/22/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-672
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia10/11/2007 Referred to
04/15/2008 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/04/2008 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia06/19/2008 Referred to
04/03/2008 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3774. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/03/2008)

Senior Executive Service Diversity Assurance Act - Requires the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to establish within OPM the Senior Executive Service Resource Office to make recommendations to the Director with respect to regulations, and to provide guidance to agencies, concerning the structure, management, and diverse composition of the Senior Executive Service (SES).

Makes it the Office's mission to: (1) improve the efficiency, effectiveness, and productivity of the SES through policy formulation and oversight; (2) advance the professionalism of the SES; and (3) ensure that, in seeking to achieve an SES reflective of the nation's diversity, recruitment is from qualified individuals from appropriate sources.

Requires the Office to make statistics concerning career reserved positions accessible to the public through the official public website of OPM.

Revises the career appointments recruiting process to require agency heads to ensure diversity of executive resources boards, and any subgroup or other evaluation panel related to the merit staffing process for career appointees, by including members of racial and ethnic minority groups, women, and individuals with disabilities. Requires the Director to promulgate necessary regulations and report to Congress on agency efforts to improve diversity in executive resources boards and of qualifications review boards, based on the collection of statistics concerning race, ethnicity, sex, and disability required by this Act.

Requires each agency, within one year after enactment of this Act, to submit to OPM a plan to enhance and maximize opportunities for the advancement and appointment of minorities, women, and individuals with disabilities in the agency to the SES. Requires the plans to: (1) address how the agency is identifying and eliminating barriers that impair the ability of such employees to obtain appointments and any actions the agency is taking to provide advancement opportunities; and (2) be updated at least biennially. Requires the Director to report to Congress on plans and updates.