Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/31/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/17/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/06/2008