There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Andrew Larochelle God, Family, and Country Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Architect of the Capitol to permit the acknowledgment of God on flag certificates.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/09/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
10/09/2007Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/09/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (119)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/09/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/12/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/12/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/12/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/12/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/12/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/12/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/12/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/12/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/12/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/12/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/12/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/12/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/12/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/12/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/15/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/18/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/31/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/06/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration10/09/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3779. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/09/2007)

Andrew Larochelle God, Family, and Country Act of 2007 - Authorizes the Architect of the Capitol to permit the acknowledgment of God on flag certificates issued at the request of a Member of the United States House of Representatives or of the United States Senate.