Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/09/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/12/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/12/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/12/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/12/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/12/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/12/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/12/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/12/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/12/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/12/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/12/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/12/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/12/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/12/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/12/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/15/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/18/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/31/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/06/2008