Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/10/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/25/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/30/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/31/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/31/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/13/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/15/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/15/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/15/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/29/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/25/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/13/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/18/2008