Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/28/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/28/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 01/28/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 02/06/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/12/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/21/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/21/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/21/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/05/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/03/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/23/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/15/2008