Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/04/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/2008