Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/18/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/09/2007