Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/18/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/31/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/31/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/31/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/31/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/31/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/15/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/15/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/15/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/15/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/15/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 11/15/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/15/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/15/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 11/15/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/15/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/15/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/15/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/15/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/19/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/29/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/29/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/04/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/13/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/04/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/04/2008