Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/15/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/14/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/11/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/15/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/16/2008