Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/06/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/22/2008