Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/05/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/18/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/07/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/03/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/03/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/13/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/14/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/31/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/09/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/02/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/19/2008