Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/31/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/05/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/06/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/06/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/07/2007