Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/22/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/23/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/24/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/25/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/29/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/29/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/30/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/30/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/06/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/09/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/13/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/23/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/23/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/29/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/12/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/13/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/20/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/09/2008