Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 10/17/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/23/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/23/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/23/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/23/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/23/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/24/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/24/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/24/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/24/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/24/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/24/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/24/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/24/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/24/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/24/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/25/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/25/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/25/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/25/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/31/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/01/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/01/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/01/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/06/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/07/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/07/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/14/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/14/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/05/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/09/2008