Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/23/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/29/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/29/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/29/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/29/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/31/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/09/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2007