Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/18/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/24/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/24/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/07/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/09/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/04/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/06/2007