Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 10/18/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/22/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/23/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/29/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/29/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/11/2007