Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/31/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/13/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/06/2008