Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/05/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/09/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/10/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/27/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/02/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/03/2008