Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 10/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/23/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/23/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/31/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/31/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/13/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/04/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/10/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/11/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/12/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/17/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/28/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/29/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/12/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/25/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/03/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/03/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/03/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/05/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/05/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/05/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/05/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/13/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/14/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/01/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/03/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/10/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/16/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/04/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/18/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/21/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/31/2008