Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/24/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/31/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/22/2007