Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/24/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/29/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/30/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/15/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/06/2007