Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/24/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/24/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/24/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/24/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/22/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/19/2008