Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/24/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/05/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/14/2008