Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/11/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/16/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/25/2008